THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:58:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2020
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3045 Baseline Road
Queensway Carleton Hospital
Hospitalist
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137212000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Aa-530 Fred St
North Dundas Medical Clinic
Winchester ON K0C 2K0
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Sep 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 19 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester
HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Winchester District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Winchester

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tanvir S Minhas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Nov 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Minhas (CPSO#: 122137 )
Business Address: 3045 Baseline Rd
Nepean ON K2H 8P4
6137212000
Business Address: 566 Louise St
Winchester ON K0C 2K0
6137742420

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3045 Baseline Road
Queensway Carleton Hospital
Hospitalist
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137212000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Aa-530 Fred St
North Dundas Medical Clinic
Winchester ON K0C 2K0
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Sep 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 19 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester
HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Winchester District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Winchester

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tanvir S Minhas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Nov 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Minhas (CPSO#: 122137 )
Business Address: 3045 Baseline Rd
Nepean ON K2H 8P4
6137212000
Business Address: 566 Louise St
Winchester ON K0C 2K0
6137742420

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TANVIR SINGH MINHAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MINHAS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TANVIR SINGH MINHAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MINHAS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2020

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020