THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:48:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 146 Oliver Rd
Campbellford Memorial Hospital
Campbellford ON K0L 1L0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 28 Oct 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 28 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Northumberland Hills Hospital Cobourg
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
HOSPITAL: Northumberland Hills Hospital
LOCATION: Cobourg

HOSPITAL: Campbellford Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Campbellford

HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Li Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Jul 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Li (CPSO#: 122153 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 146 Oliver Rd
Campbellford Memorial Hospital
Campbellford ON K0L 1L0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 28 Oct 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 28 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Northumberland Hills Hospital Cobourg
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
HOSPITAL: Northumberland Hills Hospital
LOCATION: Cobourg

HOSPITAL: Campbellford Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Campbellford

HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Li Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Jul 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Li (CPSO#: 122153 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID KENNY LI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID KENNY LI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Dec 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 13 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Dec 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020