THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 03:36:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Hospital Crt
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
Oshawa ON L1G 2B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax Ontario L1S 2J4
Phone: 905) 683-2320
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 220 Dundas Street West
Whitby Ontario L1N 8M7
Phone: 9056659001
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 08 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Vanaja Sivakumar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jul 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Sivakumar (CPSO#: 122178 )
Business Address:
Business Address:
Business Address:
Business Address: 1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 8A2
Business Address: 580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax Ontario L1S 2J4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Hospital Crt
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
Oshawa ON L1G 2B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax Ontario L1S 2J4
Phone: 905) 683-2320
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 220 Dundas Street West
Whitby Ontario L1N 8M7
Phone: 9056659001
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 08 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Vanaja Sivakumar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jul 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Sivakumar (CPSO#: 122178 )
Business Address:
Business Address:
Business Address:
Business Address: 1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 8A2
Business Address: 580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax Ontario L1S 2J4

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VANAJA THEEPA SIVAKUMAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIVAKUMAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VANAJA THEEPA SIVAKUMAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIVAKUMAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 27 Oct 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jul 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Oct 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 27 Oct 2022
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 26 Oct 2025

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020