THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:12:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 104-3885 Duke of York Blvd
Medicare Clinic Square One
Mississauga ON L5B 0E4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058484844
Fax: 9052324847

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. MAHGOOB MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Nov 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Mahgoob (CPSO#: 122197 )
Business Address: 104-3885 Duke of York Boulevard
Medical Clinic Square One
Mississauga Ontario L5B 0E4
9058484844

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 104-3885 Duke of York Blvd
Medicare Clinic Square One
Mississauga ON L5B 0E4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058484844
Fax: 9052324847

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. MAHGOOB MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Nov 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Mahgoob (CPSO#: 122197 )
Business Address: 104-3885 Duke of York Boulevard
Medical Clinic Square One
Mississauga Ontario L5B 0E4
9058484844

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OMAR RASHEED MAHGOOB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAHGOOB is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OMAR RASHEED MAHGOOB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAHGOOB is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020