THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 04:28:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Lincoln Memorial University, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TURKISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: KMH Cardiology Centres Inc
437 Norwich Ave
Woodstock Ontario N4S 3W4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Telemed MD
2200 Dundas St East
Unit 300
Mississauga Ontario L4X 2V3
Phone: 1-888-350-2323
Fax: 1-833-479-0224

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: SEVAN EVREN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Feb 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Evren (CPSO#: 122208 )
Business Address: 16 Woodthrush Crt
North York ON M2K 2B1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TURKISH
Medical School: Lincoln Memorial University, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: KMH Cardiology Centres Inc
437 Norwich Ave
Woodstock Ontario N4S 3W4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Telemed MD
2200 Dundas St East
Unit 300
Mississauga Ontario L4X 2V3
Phone: 1-888-350-2323
Fax: 1-833-479-0224

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: SEVAN EVREN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Feb 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Evren (CPSO#: 122208 )
Business Address: 16 Woodthrush Crt
North York ON M2K 2B1

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
27 Jan 2022
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jan 27 2022
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. SEVAN EVREN may practise medicine independently in internal medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. SEVAN EVREN may practise medicine independently in internal medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Lincoln Memorial University, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 27 Jan 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 27 Jan 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020