THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:13:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: Alikhassi Habibabadi, Afsaneh (Used Until: 06 Jan 2025)
Medical School: Shahid Beheshti University of Medical Sciences Faculty of Medicine, 2003
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2075 Bayview Ave
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Center
Department of Medical Imaging, M6
Room 261
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Fax: (416) 480-5266

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 06 May 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 06 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Afsaneh Alikhassi Habibabadi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Nov 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Alikhassi (CPSO#: 122241 )
Business Address: 2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
(416) 480-6100

General Information

Former Name: Alikhassi Habibabadi, Afsaneh (Used Until: 06 Jan 2025)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Shahid Beheshti University of Medical Sciences Faculty of Medicine, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2075 Bayview Ave
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Center
Department of Medical Imaging, M6
Room 261
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Fax: (416) 480-5266

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 06 May 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 06 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Afsaneh Alikhassi Habibabadi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Nov 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Alikhassi (CPSO#: 122241 )
Business Address: 2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
(416) 480-6100

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AFSANEH ALIKHASSI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALIKHASSI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AFSANEH ALIKHASSI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALIKHASSI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Shahid Beheshti University of Medical Sciences Faculty of Medicine, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2022
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 22 Sep 2029

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 2020