THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:23:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidad de Buenos Aires Facultad de Medicina, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 76 Stuart St
Kingston General Hospital
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 17 May 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 17 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. DIAZ DILERNIA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Jul 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Diaz Dilernia (CPSO#: 122248 )
Business Address: 76 Stuart St
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
613-549-6666 Extn: 3670

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Universidad de Buenos Aires Facultad de Medicina, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 76 Stuart St
Kingston General Hospital
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 17 May 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 17 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. DIAZ DILERNIA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Jul 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Diaz Dilernia (CPSO#: 122248 )
Business Address: 76 Stuart St
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
613-549-6666 Extn: 3670

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
17 May 2023
30 Jun 2026
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 17 2023
EXPIRY DATE: Jun 30 2026
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. FERNANDO DIAZ DILERNIA may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Surgery, Division of Orthopedic Surgery, Queen's University, in which Dr. DIAZ DILERNIA holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. DIAZ DILERNIA no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. DIAZ DILERNIA’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. DIAZ DILERNIA’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 17 May, 2023, and expires on 30 June, 2026. Upon renewal of Dr. DIAZ DILERNIA's academic appointment at Queen's University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. FERNANDO DIAZ DILERNIA may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Surgery, Division of Orthopedic Surgery, Queen's University, in which Dr. DIAZ DILERNIA holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. DIAZ DILERNIA no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. DIAZ DILERNIA’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. DIAZ DILERNIA’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 17 May, 2023, and expires on 30 June, 2026. Upon renewal of Dr. DIAZ DILERNIA's academic appointment at Queen's University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidad de Buenos Aires Facultad de Medicina, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 17 May 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 09 Aug 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jul 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 May 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 May 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2020