THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:47:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidade Federal de Minas Gerais, 2007
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Joseph's Healthcare
West 5th Campus
100 W 5th St
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 13 Jul 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 13 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dante Duarte Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Apr 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Duarte (CPSO#: 122286 )
Business Address: 100 West 5th Street
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
West 5th Campus
Hamilton Ontario L9C 0E3

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Universidade Federal de Minas Gerais, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Joseph's Healthcare
West 5th Campus
100 W 5th St
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 13 Jul 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 13 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dante Duarte Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Apr 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Duarte (CPSO#: 122286 )
Business Address: 100 West 5th Street
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
West 5th Campus
Hamilton Ontario L9C 0E3

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
04 Mar 2024
30 Jun 2027
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 04 2024
EXPIRY DATE: Jun 30 2027
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Dante Galileu Guedes Duarte may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
Psychiatry and Behavioural Sciences, Division of Geriatric
Psychiatry, McMaster University, in which Dr. Duarte holds an
academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
the date of issuance or when Dr. Duarte no longer holds the academic
appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Duarte's clinical
performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or
academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Duarte's certificate
of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
report.


Note: This certificate is issued on July 13, 2020, and expires on June 30,
2027. Upon renewal of Dr. Duarte's academic appointment at McMaster
University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations
in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Dante Galileu Guedes Duarte may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
Psychiatry and Behavioural Sciences, Division of Geriatric
Psychiatry, McMaster University, in which Dr. Duarte holds an
academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
the date of issuance or when Dr. Duarte no longer holds the academic
appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Duarte's clinical
performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or
academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Duarte's certificate
of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
report.


Note: This certificate is issued on July 13, 2020, and expires on June 30,
2027. Upon renewal of Dr. Duarte's academic appointment at McMaster
University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations
in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidade Federal de Minas Gerais, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2027
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2027

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 13 Jul 2020