THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 04:48:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Sudbury ON P3E 5J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 14 Jul 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Cardiology
Effective: 14 Jul 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 14 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 14 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gregory Papadopoulos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Aug 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Papadopoulos (CPSO#: 122289 )
Business Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
(705) 523-7254

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Sudbury ON P3E 5J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 14 Jul 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Cardiology
Effective: 14 Jul 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 14 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 14 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gregory Papadopoulos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Aug 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Papadopoulos (CPSO#: 122289 )
Business Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
(705) 523-7254

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
21 Apr 2022
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Apr 21 2022
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. GREGORY PAPADOPOULOS may practise medicine independently in internal medicine and cardiology.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. GREGORY PAPADOPOULOS may practise medicine independently in internal medicine and cardiology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 21 Apr 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 15 Dec 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 21 Apr 2022

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 15 Dec 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 14 Jul 2020