THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:13:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Peking University Health Science Center, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 11E-200 Elizabeth St
Toronto General Hospital – UHN
Department of Pathology
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Oshawa Hospital
1 Hospital Crt
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 01 Aug 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 01 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. CHEN YANG MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Sep 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Yang (CPSO#: 122308 )
Business Address: 200 Elizabeth St
Toronto General Hospital - UHN
Department of Pathology
11E
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Business Address: 1 Hospital Crt
Oshawa Hospital
Oshawa ON L1G 2B9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Peking University Health Science Center, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 11E-200 Elizabeth St
Toronto General Hospital – UHN
Department of Pathology
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Oshawa Hospital
1 Hospital Crt
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 01 Aug 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 01 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. CHEN YANG MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Sep 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Yang (CPSO#: 122308 )
Business Address: 200 Elizabeth St
Toronto General Hospital - UHN
Department of Pathology
11E
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Business Address: 1 Hospital Crt
Oshawa Hospital
Oshawa ON L1G 2B9

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
15 Dec 2021
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Dec 15 2021
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. CHEN YANG may practise medicine independently in anatomical pathology.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. CHEN YANG may practise medicine independently in anatomical pathology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Peking University Health Science Center, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 15 Dec 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 15 Dec 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2020