THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:34:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Wollongong, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kawartha North Family Health Team
50 Colbourne St
Fenelon Falls Ontario K0M 1N0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 10-101 East St S
100 east street south
kawartha family health team
Bobcaygeon ON K0M 1A0
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Apr 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 04 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. L. JOHNSON MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Nov 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Johnson (CPSO#: 122330 )
Business Address: 100-295 The West Mall
Toronto Ontario M9C 4Z4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Wollongong, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kawartha North Family Health Team
50 Colbourne St
Fenelon Falls Ontario K0M 1N0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 10-101 East St S
100 east street south
kawartha family health team
Bobcaygeon ON K0M 1A0
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Apr 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 04 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. L. JOHNSON MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Nov 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Johnson (CPSO#: 122330 )
Business Address: 100-295 The West Mall
Toronto Ontario M9C 4Z4

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LUKE IVAN JOHNSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHNSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LUKE IVAN JOHNSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHNSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Wollongong, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Nov 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Sep 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Nov 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 2022
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 11 Jul 2025

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 03 Sep 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2020