THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 04:29:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ibadan College of Medicine, 2004
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 523 Algoma Street North
Thunder Bay Ontario P7A 5C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 8073462370
Fax: 8073462371
Address: 1001 Ridgeway Street East
Thunder Bay Ontario P7E 5H8
Phone: 8076220601
Fax: 8076226427

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Nov 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 14 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ibadan College of Medicine, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 523 Algoma Street North
Thunder Bay Ontario P7A 5C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 8073462370
Fax: 8073462371
Address: 1001 Ridgeway Street East
Thunder Bay Ontario P7E 5H8
Phone: 8076220601
Fax: 8076226427

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Nov 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 14 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OMOLARA OLOLADE ODULAJA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ODULAJA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OMOLARA OLOLADE ODULAJA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ODULAJA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ibadan College of Medicine, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Nov 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Nov 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jul 2020