THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:19:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidade Estadual de Campinas, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137985555
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 01 Feb 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 01 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: BARBOSA RAIMONDI BELFIORE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Apr 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Barbosa Raimondi Belfiore (CPSO#: 122346 )
Business Address: 1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE
Medical School: Universidade Estadual de Campinas, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137985555
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 01 Feb 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 01 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: BARBOSA RAIMONDI BELFIORE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Apr 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Barbosa Raimondi Belfiore (CPSO#: 122346 )
Business Address: 1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
01 Feb 2024
31 Jan 2027
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Feb 01 2024
EXPIRY DATE: Jan 31 2027
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. ELIO BARBOSA RAIMONDI BELFIORE may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Anesthesiology and Pain Medicine, University of Ottawa, in which Dr. BARBOSA RAIMONDI BELFIORE holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. BARBOSA RAIMONDI BELFIORE no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. BARBOSA RAIMONDI BELFIORE’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. BARBOSA RAIMONDI BELFIORE’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 February, 2024, and expires on 31 January, 2027. Upon renewal of Dr. BARBOSA RAIMONDI BELFIORE's academic appointment at the University of Ottawa, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. ELIO BARBOSA RAIMONDI BELFIORE may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Anesthesiology and Pain Medicine, University of Ottawa, in which Dr. BARBOSA RAIMONDI BELFIORE holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. BARBOSA RAIMONDI BELFIORE no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. BARBOSA RAIMONDI BELFIORE’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. BARBOSA RAIMONDI BELFIORE’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 February, 2024, and expires on 31 January, 2027. Upon renewal of Dr. BARBOSA RAIMONDI BELFIORE's academic appointment at the University of Ottawa, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidade Estadual de Campinas, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jan 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Feb 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Feb 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 31 Jan 2027

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jan 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jul 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2023

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jul 2020