THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:21:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 555 Prince Charles Drive North
Welland Ontario L3C 4J6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058083103
Fax: 9052282955
Address: 5546 Portage Road
Niagara Health - Niagara Falls Site
Niagara Falls Ontario L2G 1J4
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1200 Fourth Avenue
Niagara Health - St. Catharines Site
Division of General Surgery
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 65 Third Street
Niagara Health - Welland Site
Welland Ontario L3B 5X9
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 28 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 28 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 555 Prince Charles Drive North
Welland Ontario L3C 4J6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058083103
Fax: 9052282955
Address: 5546 Portage Road
Niagara Health - Niagara Falls Site
Niagara Falls Ontario L2G 1J4
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1200 Fourth Avenue
Niagara Health - St. Catharines Site
Division of General Surgery
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 65 Third Street
Niagara Health - Welland Site
Welland Ontario L3B 5X9
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 28 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 28 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICOLE JEDRZEJKO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JEDRZEJKO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICOLE JEDRZEJKO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JEDRZEJKO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 20 Sep 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jul 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 20 Sep 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jul 2020