THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:54:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Turin, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 25 King St W
Kingston Health Sciences Centre
Kingston ON K7L 5P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-548-3232
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 76 Stuart St
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 10 Stuart St
Kingston ON K7L 2V5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 01 Aug 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 01 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Genta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Aug 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Genta (CPSO#: 122369 )
Business Address: 25 King St W
Kingston ON K7L 5P9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Turin, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 25 King St W
Kingston Health Sciences Centre
Kingston ON K7L 5P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-548-3232
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 76 Stuart St
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 10 Stuart St
Kingston ON K7L 2V5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 01 Aug 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 01 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Genta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Aug 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Genta (CPSO#: 122369 )
Business Address: 25 King St W
Kingston ON K7L 5P9

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
01 Aug 2023
30 Jun 2026
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Aug 01 2023
EXPIRY DATE: Jun 30 2026
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. SOFIA GENTA may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Oncology, Division of Medical Oncology, Queen's University, in which Dr. GENTA holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. GENTA no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. GENTA’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. GENTA’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 August, 2023, and expires on 30 June, 2026. Upon renewal of Dr. GENTA's academic appointment at Queen's University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. SOFIA GENTA may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Oncology, Division of Medical Oncology, Queen's University, in which Dr. GENTA holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. GENTA no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. GENTA’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. GENTA’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 August, 2023, and expires on 30 June, 2026. Upon renewal of Dr. GENTA's academic appointment at Queen's University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Turin, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2023

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jul 2020