THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 05:05:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 9401 Jane Street
York Clinical Cardiology
Unit 117
Vaughan Ontario L6A 4H7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289-963-2273
Fax: 905-303-0052

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 30 Apr 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Internal Medicine
Effective: 24 Jul 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 24 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
Northumberland Hills Hospital Cobourg
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Northumberland Hills Hospital
LOCATION: Cobourg

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Khalid W. Pasha Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jul 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Pasha (CPSO#: 122371 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 9401 Jane Street
York Clinical Cardiology
Unit 117
Vaughan Ontario L6A 4H7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289-963-2273
Fax: 905-303-0052

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 30 Apr 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Internal Medicine
Effective: 24 Jul 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 24 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
Northumberland Hills Hospital Cobourg
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Northumberland Hills Hospital
LOCATION: Cobourg

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Khalid W. Pasha Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jul 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Pasha (CPSO#: 122371 )

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
15 Jul 2022
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jul 15 2022
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. KHALID WAJID PASHA may practise medicine independently in internal medicine and cardiology.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. KHALID WAJID PASHA may practise medicine independently in internal medicine and cardiology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 15 Jul 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 23 Jun 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 16 Jan 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 15 Jul 2022

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 16 Jan 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 24 Jul 2020