THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 05:52:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: KMH Cardiology Centres Inc
106 - 180 Vine St S
St. Catharines Ontario L2R 7P3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 03 Aug 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 03 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mihir Soparkar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Soparkar (CPSO#: 122374 )
Business Address: 180 Vine St S
Suite 106
St Catharines ON L2R 7P3

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: KMH Cardiology Centres Inc
106 - 180 Vine St S
St. Catharines Ontario L2R 7P3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 03 Aug 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 03 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mihir Soparkar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Soparkar (CPSO#: 122374 )
Business Address: 180 Vine St S
Suite 106
St Catharines ON L2R 7P3

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
25 May 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 25 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. MIHIR SOPARKAR may practise medicine independently in internal medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. MIHIR SOPARKAR may practise medicine independently in internal medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 25 May 2023
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 28 Jul 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 27 Jan 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 25 May 2023

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 28 Jul 2022

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 27 Jan 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Aug 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 03 Aug 2020