THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:05:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2-18 Plains Rd W
Aldershot Village Medical Clinic
Burlington ON L7T 0B3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9052186444
Fax: 9055212775

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR.DAVID BOULS MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Nov 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Bouls (CPSO#: 122410 )
Business Address: 2-18 Plains Rd W
Burlington ON L7T 0B3

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2-18 Plains Rd W
Aldershot Village Medical Clinic
Burlington ON L7T 0B3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9052186444
Fax: 9055212775

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR.DAVID BOULS MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Nov 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Bouls (CPSO#: 122410 )
Business Address: 2-18 Plains Rd W
Burlington ON L7T 0B3

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID THARWAT TAWFIK BOULS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOULS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID THARWAT TAWFIK BOULS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOULS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Mar 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Mar 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Aug 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Aug 2020