THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:07:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Damascus Faculty of Medicine, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 80 Grand Avenue West
Chatham Ontario N7L 1B7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5193526401
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 65 Thames Street
Chatham Ontario N7L 2Z5
Phone: 5193581880
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 100 King Street West
Chatham Ontario N7M 6A9
Phone: 5193581880
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
Effective: 21 Dec 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 21 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
HOSPITAL: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. K. SALLAM MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jul 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Sallam (CPSO#: 122437 )
Business Address: 80 Grand Avenue West
Chatham Ontario N7L 1B7
5193526401

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Damascus Faculty of Medicine, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 80 Grand Avenue West
Chatham Ontario N7L 1B7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5193526401
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 65 Thames Street
Chatham Ontario N7L 2Z5
Phone: 5193581880
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 100 King Street West
Chatham Ontario N7M 6A9
Phone: 5193581880
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
Effective: 21 Dec 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 21 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
HOSPITAL: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. K. SALLAM MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jul 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Sallam (CPSO#: 122437 )
Business Address: 80 Grand Avenue West
Chatham Ontario N7L 1B7
5193526401

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KHALDOUN MATROUK SALLAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALLAM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KHALDOUN MATROUK SALLAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALLAM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Damascus Faculty of Medicine, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 21 Jul 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Apr 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 21 Jul 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2020