THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 02:47:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Lagos, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 34 Main St W,
Box 310
Beeton Ontario L0G 1A0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9057290412
Fax: 9057480266
Address: 640 Grace St
Newmarket ON L3Y 8V7
Phone: 905-895-7661
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Nigeria

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Adeseye Adeola Soile Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Dec 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Soile (CPSO#: 122502 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Lagos, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 34 Main St W,
Box 310
Beeton Ontario L0G 1A0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9057290412
Fax: 9057480266
Address: 640 Grace St
Newmarket ON L3Y 8V7
Phone: 905-895-7661
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Nigeria

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Adeseye Adeola Soile Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Dec 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Soile (CPSO#: 122502 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADESEYE ADEOLA SOILE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOILE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADESEYE ADEOLA SOILE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOILE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Lagos, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2020
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Aug 2020