THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:31:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidade Catolica De Pelotas, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Lawrence Medical Clinic
Morrisburg Clinic
100 - 34 Ottawa St
Morrisburg Ontario K0C 1X0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 543-2963
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St. Lawrence Medical Clinic
Ingleside Clinic
2 Thorold Ln
Ingleside Ontario K0C 1M0
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Winchester District
Memorial Hospital
566 Louise St
Winchester Ontario K0C 2K0
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Feb 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 11 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester
HOSPITAL: Winchester District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Winchester

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Carlos Cunha Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 May 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Cunha (CPSO#: 122506 )
Business Address: 100- 34 Ottawa St
Morrisburg Ontario K0C 1X0

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE, SPANISH
Medical School: Universidade Catolica De Pelotas, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Lawrence Medical Clinic
Morrisburg Clinic
100 - 34 Ottawa St
Morrisburg Ontario K0C 1X0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 543-2963
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St. Lawrence Medical Clinic
Ingleside Clinic
2 Thorold Ln
Ingleside Ontario K0C 1M0
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Winchester District
Memorial Hospital
566 Louise St
Winchester Ontario K0C 2K0
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Feb 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 11 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester
HOSPITAL: Winchester District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Winchester

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Carlos Cunha Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 May 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Cunha (CPSO#: 122506 )
Business Address: 100- 34 Ottawa St
Morrisburg Ontario K0C 1X0

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CARLOS EDUARDO CUNHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CUNHA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CARLOS EDUARDO CUNHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CUNHA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidade Catolica De Pelotas, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Nov 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Aug 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Aug 2020