THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:40:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: American University Of Antigua, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 14-9425 Leslie St
Fountain Medical & Wellness
Richmond Hill ON L4B 3N7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 11290 Pine Valley Dr
Kristus Darzs Latvian Home
Woodbridge ON L3L 0B1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Sep 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 16 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fairyal Kassam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jun 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Kassam (CPSO#: 122592 )
Business Address: 14-9425 Leslie St
Richmond Hill ON L4B 3N7
9052376189

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: American University Of Antigua, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 14-9425 Leslie St
Fountain Medical & Wellness
Richmond Hill ON L4B 3N7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 11290 Pine Valley Dr
Kristus Darzs Latvian Home
Woodbridge ON L3L 0B1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Sep 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 16 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fairyal Kassam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jun 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Kassam (CPSO#: 122592 )
Business Address: 14-9425 Leslie St
Richmond Hill ON L4B 3N7
9052376189

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
18 Feb 2022
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Feb 18 2022
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. FAIRYAL KASSAM may practise medicine independently in family medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. FAIRYAL KASSAM may practise medicine independently in family medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: American University Of Antigua, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 18 Feb 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 18 Feb 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Sep 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 16 Sep 2020