THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:06:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Tanta University, 1987
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 550 Arbutus Way
Mississauga Ontario L5B 3M8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055664567
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1-499 Ray Lawson Boulevard
Brampton Ontario L6Y 0N2
Phone: 905 460 1100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. R. MEKHAIL MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 18 Jan 2025

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Tanta University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 550 Arbutus Way
Mississauga Ontario L5B 3M8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055664567
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1-499 Ray Lawson Boulevard
Brampton Ontario L6Y 0N2
Phone: 905 460 1100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. R. MEKHAIL MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 18 Jan 2025

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RENIH TAKLA FANOUS MEKHAIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEKHAIL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RENIH TAKLA FANOUS MEKHAIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEKHAIL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Tanta University, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Aug 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Sep 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 10 Sep 2020