THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:54:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2019
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1110 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 204
Toronto Ontario M2K 2W1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-229-2315
Fax: 416-223-9828
Address: 10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
Phone: 905-883-1212
Extension: 2064
Fax: 905-883-0772
Address: 240 Alton Towers Circle
Toronto Ontario M1V 4P2
Phone: 4163212613
Fax: 4163216844

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1110 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 204
Toronto Ontario M2K 2W1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-229-2315
Fax: 416-223-9828
Address: 10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
Phone: 905-883-1212
Extension: 2064
Fax: 905-883-0772
Address: 240 Alton Towers Circle
Toronto Ontario M1V 4P2
Phone: 4163212613
Fax: 4163216844

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. XIAO TIAN HE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. XIAO TIAN HE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Oct 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Aug 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 16 Aug 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Oct 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2020