THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:49:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1991
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 403-2065 Finch Ave W
Dr. Eman Ibrahim Office
North York ON M3N 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4166487390
Fax: 4167647839
Address: 104-2065 Finch Ave W
Oakdale Walk in Medical Centre
North York ON M3N 2V7
Phone: 4169015119
Fax: 4169015118

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr Eman Ibrahim Medicine professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jul 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Ibrahim (CPSO#: 122637 )
Business Address: 2065 Finch Ave W
North York ON M3N 2V7
4169015119

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 403-2065 Finch Ave W
Dr. Eman Ibrahim Office
North York ON M3N 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4166487390
Fax: 4167647839
Address: 104-2065 Finch Ave W
Oakdale Walk in Medical Centre
North York ON M3N 2V7
Phone: 4169015119
Fax: 4169015118

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr Eman Ibrahim Medicine professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jul 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Ibrahim (CPSO#: 122637 )
Business Address: 2065 Finch Ave W
North York ON M3N 2V7
4169015119

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EMAN EBAID FAHIM IBRAHIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IBRAHIM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EMAN EBAID FAHIM IBRAHIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IBRAHIM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jan 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2020