THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:45:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: American University Of Antigua, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth St
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst St
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 01 Sep 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Massachusetts

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hiren Patel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Patel (CPSO#: 122638 )
Business Address: 200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
416-340-3131
Business Address: 399 Bathurst STreet
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
416-603-2581

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: American University Of Antigua, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth St
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst St
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 01 Sep 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Massachusetts

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hiren Patel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Patel (CPSO#: 122638 )
Business Address: 200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
416-340-3131
Business Address: 399 Bathurst STreet
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
416-603-2581

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
27 Jan 2022
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jan 27 2022
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. HIREN PATEL may practise medicine independently in emergency medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. HIREN PATEL may practise medicine independently in emergency medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: American University Of Antigua, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 27 Jan 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 27 Jan 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2020