THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 03:38:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Asyut University, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 50 Sportsworld Crossing Rd
E1-03
Kitchener ON N2P 0A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5199572057
Fax: 5488893482

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Dec 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 04 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Khella Medicine professional corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jun 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Khella (CPSO#: 122682 )
Business Address: 3-492 Edinburgh Rd S
Guelph ON N1G 4Z1
Business Address: 50 Sportsworld Crossing Road
clinic
Bundle Medical Centre
E1-03
Kitchener Ontario N2P 0A4
5199572057
Business Address: 385 Fairway Rd S
Kitchener ON N2C 2N9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Asyut University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 50 Sportsworld Crossing Rd
E1-03
Kitchener ON N2P 0A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5199572057
Fax: 5488893482

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Dec 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 04 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Khella Medicine professional corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jun 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Khella (CPSO#: 122682 )
Business Address: 3-492 Edinburgh Rd S
Guelph ON N1G 4Z1
Business Address: 50 Sportsworld Crossing Road
clinic
Bundle Medical Centre
E1-03
Kitchener Ontario N2P 0A4
5199572057
Business Address: 385 Fairway Rd S
Kitchener ON N2C 2N9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN MAKRAM HABIB KHELLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHELLA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN MAKRAM HABIB KHELLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHELLA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Asyut University, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2020
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2020