THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:16:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Obafemi Awolowo College of Health Sciences, Olabisi Onabanjo University, 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 14B-1370 Dundas St E
Mississauga ON L4Y 4G4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6478486404
Fax: 6476897030
Address: 2200 Dundas St E
Mississauga ON L4X 2V3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Nov 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 03 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E A OREBIYI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Dec 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Orebiyi (CPSO#: 122718 )
Business Address: 279 Duskywing Way
Oakville ON L6L 6X5
Business Address: 368 Nautical Blvd
Oakville ON L6L 0C1
+16479160914
Business Address: 14B-1370 Dundas St E
Mississauga ON L4Y 4G4
6478486404

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Obafemi Awolowo College of Health Sciences, Olabisi Onabanjo University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 14B-1370 Dundas St E
Mississauga ON L4Y 4G4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6478486404
Fax: 6476897030
Address: 2200 Dundas St E
Mississauga ON L4X 2V3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Nov 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 03 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E A OREBIYI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Dec 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Orebiyi (CPSO#: 122718 )
Business Address: 279 Duskywing Way
Oakville ON L6L 6X5
Business Address: 368 Nautical Blvd
Oakville ON L6L 0C1
+16479160914
Business Address: 14B-1370 Dundas St E
Mississauga ON L4Y 4G4
6478486404

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADEKUNLE EMMANUEL OREBIYI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OREBIYI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADEKUNLE EMMANUEL OREBIYI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OREBIYI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Obafemi Awolowo College of Health Sciences, Olabisi Onabanjo University, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Feb 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2020