THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:04:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Nigeria, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 19 Elgin St
Primepoint Medical Clinic
St Thomas ON N5R 3L7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-207-6601
Fax: 1-866-650-0506

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Mar 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 07 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr Anthony Ezepue Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Oct 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ezepue (CPSO#: 122773 )
Business Address: 19 Elgin Street
19 Elgin Street
St. Thomas Ontario N5R 3L7
519-207-6601

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Nigeria, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 19 Elgin St
Primepoint Medical Clinic
St Thomas ON N5R 3L7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-207-6601
Fax: 1-866-650-0506

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Mar 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 07 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr Anthony Ezepue Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Oct 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ezepue (CPSO#: 122773 )
Business Address: 19 Elgin Street
19 Elgin Street
St. Thomas Ontario N5R 3L7
519-207-6601

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANTHONY CHUKWUEMEKA EZEPUE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EZEPUE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANTHONY CHUKWUEMEKA EZEPUE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EZEPUE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Nigeria, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 29 Apr 2021
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Apr 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 29 Apr 2021