THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:33:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the Punjab, 1998
Gender: No Information Available
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bonavista Medical Centre
104 - 265 King George Rd
Brantford Ontario N3R 6Y1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 230 James St S
Charlton medical centre
Hamilton ON L8P 3B3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Aug 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 24 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR SAMINA SHAIKHMEDICINE PROFESSIONAL COORPORATIONR
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Mar 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Shaikh (CPSO#: 122788 )
Business Address: 261 King George Road
Brantford Ontario N3R 6S8

Corporation Name: DR SAMINA SHAIKH MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL COORPORATIONR
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Jan 2025

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: No Information Available
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: University of the Punjab, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bonavista Medical Centre
104 - 265 King George Rd
Brantford Ontario N3R 6Y1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 230 James St S
Charlton medical centre
Hamilton ON L8P 3B3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Aug 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 24 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR SAMINA SHAIKHMEDICINE PROFESSIONAL COORPORATIONR
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Mar 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Shaikh (CPSO#: 122788 )
Business Address: 261 King George Road
Brantford Ontario N3R 6S8

Corporation Name: DR SAMINA SHAIKH MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL COORPORATIONR
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Jan 2025

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMINA YOUNIS SHAIKH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAIKH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMINA YOUNIS SHAIKH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAIKH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the Punjab, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2021
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Aug 2021