THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:03:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Univ of California, San Francisco, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2686 Danforth Ave
Thrive Kids Clinic
Store Front
Toronto ON M4C 1L7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 849-2260
Fax: (416) 849-2261

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 28 Sep 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 28 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Raphael Buencamino Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Feb 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Buencamino (CPSO#: 122857 )
Business Address: 2686 Danforth Ave
Store Front
Toronto ON M4C 1L7
4168492260 Extn: 0

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Univ of California, San Francisco, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2686 Danforth Ave
Thrive Kids Clinic
Store Front
Toronto ON M4C 1L7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 849-2260
Fax: (416) 849-2261

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 28 Sep 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 28 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Raphael Buencamino Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Feb 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Buencamino (CPSO#: 122857 )
Business Address: 2686 Danforth Ave
Store Front
Toronto ON M4C 1L7
4168492260 Extn: 0

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
21 Apr 2022
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Apr 21 2022
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. RAPHAEL HECTOR BUENCAMINO may practise medicine independently in pediatrics.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. RAPHAEL HECTOR BUENCAMINO may practise medicine independently in pediatrics.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Univ of California, San Francisco, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 21 Apr 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 18 Feb 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 21 Apr 2022

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 18 Feb 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Sep 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 28 Sep 2020