THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:40:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Michigan State University College of Osteopathic Medicine, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 22 Mill Street W
P O Box 760
Tilbury District Family Health Team
Tilbury ON N0P 2L0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 682 2307
Fax: 519 682 9979

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 30 Nov 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Aysha Athar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Jan 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Athar (CPSO#: 122861 )
Business Address: 2-200 Brock St N
Whitby ON L1N 4H5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU
Medical School: Michigan State University College of Osteopathic Medicine, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 22 Mill Street W
P O Box 760
Tilbury District Family Health Team
Tilbury ON N0P 2L0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 682 2307
Fax: 519 682 9979

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 30 Nov 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Aysha Athar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Jan 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Athar (CPSO#: 122861 )
Business Address: 2-200 Brock St N
Whitby ON L1N 4H5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AYSHA ATHAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ATHAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AYSHA ATHAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ATHAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Michigan State University College of Osteopathic Medicine, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 10 Dec 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Feb 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Dec 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 10 Dec 2020