THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
25/04/25 23:34:17 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Xavier University School of Medicine, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 422-426 Burnhamthorpe Rd W
Mississauga ON L5B 4M6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 255-6655
Fax: (833) 666-0596

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Nov 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 26 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. ABOUD MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Oct 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Aboud (CPSO#: 122899 )
Business Address: 422-426 Burnhamthorpe Road West
Mississauga ON L5B 4M6
(647) 255-6655

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Xavier University School of Medicine, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 422-426 Burnhamthorpe Rd W
Mississauga ON L5B 4M6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 255-6655
Fax: (833) 666-0596

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Nov 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 26 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. ABOUD MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Oct 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Aboud (CPSO#: 122899 )
Business Address: 422-426 Burnhamthorpe Road West
Mississauga ON L5B 4M6
(647) 255-6655

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABDULRAHMAN ABOUD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABOUD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABDULRAHMAN ABOUD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABOUD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Xavier University School of Medicine, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Dec 2020
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Dec 2020