THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:44:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Nigeria College of Medicine, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Carling Heights Medical Centre
124 Barker St
London ON N5Y 1Y1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 204 4224
Fax: 519 204 4225

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Feb 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 05 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C.S. NZEADI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 May 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Nzeadi (CPSO#: 122926 )
Business Address: 124 Barker St
London ON N5Y 1Y1
519-204-4224

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Nigeria College of Medicine, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Carling Heights Medical Centre
124 Barker St
London ON N5Y 1Y1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 204 4224
Fax: 519 204 4225

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Feb 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 05 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C.S. NZEADI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 May 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Nzeadi (CPSO#: 122926 )
Business Address: 124 Barker St
London ON N5Y 1Y1
519-204-4224

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHETANNA SIMON NZEADI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NZEADI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHETANNA SIMON NZEADI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NZEADI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Nigeria College of Medicine, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 2021
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jan 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 20 Jan 2021