THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:55:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055212100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 70 King Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8G 1K2
Phone: 2897609550
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 711 Concession St
Hamilton ON L8V 1C3
Phone: 9055212100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Sep 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: General Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nova Scotia
Canada - Prince Edward Island
Saudi Arabia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. HAMMAM GHOLAM MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Dec 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Gholam (CPSO#: 122928 )
Business Address: 70 King Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8G 1K2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055212100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 70 King Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8G 1K2
Phone: 2897609550
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 711 Concession St
Hamilton ON L8V 1C3
Phone: 9055212100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Sep 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: General Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nova Scotia
Canada - Prince Edward Island
Saudi Arabia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. HAMMAM GHOLAM MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Dec 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Gholam (CPSO#: 122928 )
Business Address: 70 King Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8G 1K2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HAMMAM ADNAN I GHOLAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHOLAM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HAMMAM ADNAN I GHOLAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHOLAM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Sep 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Sep 2020