THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:43:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Nigeria College of Medicine, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 124 Barker St
Carling Heights Medical Centre
London ON N5Y 1Y1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-204-7776
Fax: 519-204-7771

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Dec 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 17 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: OBUTE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Aug 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Obute (CPSO#: 122944 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Nigeria College of Medicine, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 124 Barker St
Carling Heights Medical Centre
London ON N5Y 1Y1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-204-7776
Fax: 519-204-7771

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Dec 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 17 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: OBUTE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Aug 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Obute (CPSO#: 122944 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EJIKE ADOLPHUS OBUTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OBUTE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EJIKE ADOLPHUS OBUTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OBUTE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Nigeria College of Medicine, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 2021
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Dec 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jan 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 25 Jan 2021