THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:20:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Sao Paulo, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 01 Jul 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Martins Pereira Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jun 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Martins Pereira (CPSO#: 122957 )
Business Address: 30 Bond St
Anesthesia Deparment
6th Floor PGT
Toronto ON M5B 1W8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE, SPANISH
Medical School: University of Sao Paulo, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 01 Jul 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Martins Pereira Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jun 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Martins Pereira (CPSO#: 122957 )
Business Address: 30 Bond St
Anesthesia Deparment
6th Floor PGT
Toronto ON M5B 1W8

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
01 Jul 2023
30 Jun 2030
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jul 01 2023
EXPIRY DATE: Jun 30 2030
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. SERGIO MARTINS PEREIRA may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Anesthesiology and Pain Medicine, University of Toronto, in which Dr. MARTINS PEREIRA holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. MARTINS PEREIRA no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. MARTINS PEREIRA’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. MARTINS PEREIRA’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 July, 2023. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on 30 June, 2030.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. SERGIO MARTINS PEREIRA may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Anesthesiology and Pain Medicine, University of Toronto, in which Dr. MARTINS PEREIRA holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. MARTINS PEREIRA no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. MARTINS PEREIRA’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. MARTINS PEREIRA’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 July, 2023. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on 30 June, 2030.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Sao Paulo, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Nov 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2030

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2023

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Nov 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Nov 2020