THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:57:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Leicester, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, WELSH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Shelburne Centre for Health
167 Centre St.
Shelburne Ontario L9V 3R8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 925 0017
Fax: 519 925 6717
Address: 5988 8th Line
Simcoe Village and Manor
Beeton ON L0G 1A0
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 100 Rolling Hills Dr
Headwaters Hospital
Orangeville ON L9W 4X9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Nov 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 08 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Owen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 May 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Owen (CPSO#: 122961 )
Business Address: 167 Centre St
Shelburne ON L9V 3R8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, WELSH
Medical School: University of Leicester, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Shelburne Centre for Health
167 Centre St.
Shelburne Ontario L9V 3R8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 925 0017
Fax: 519 925 6717
Address: 5988 8th Line
Simcoe Village and Manor
Beeton ON L0G 1A0
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 100 Rolling Hills Dr
Headwaters Hospital
Orangeville ON L9W 4X9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Nov 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 08 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Owen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 May 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Owen (CPSO#: 122961 )
Business Address: 167 Centre St
Shelburne ON L9V 3R8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEFFAN RHYS OWEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OWEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEFFAN RHYS OWEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OWEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Leicester, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 2021
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Feb 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Mar 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 08 Mar 2021