THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:37:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Shanghai Second Medical College, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ratya Family Medical Centre
202-1637 Woodroffe Ave
Nepean ON K2G 1W2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Nov 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 23 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. MOHAMED UWAIS MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Mar 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mohamed Uwais (CPSO#: 122979 )
Business Address: 202-1637 Woodroffe Ave
Nepean ON K2G 1W2
6137235635

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Shanghai Second Medical College, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ratya Family Medical Centre
202-1637 Woodroffe Ave
Nepean ON K2G 1W2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Nov 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 23 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. MOHAMED UWAIS MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Mar 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mohamed Uwais (CPSO#: 122979 )
Business Address: 202-1637 Woodroffe Ave
Nepean ON K2G 1W2
6137235635

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHAMED SALEEM MOHAMED UWAIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOHAMED UWAIS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHAMED SALEEM MOHAMED UWAIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOHAMED UWAIS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Shanghai Second Medical College, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Dec 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 06 Nov 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Dec 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Nov 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 06 Nov 2020