THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:11:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2826A Markham Road
Health Check Clinic
Toronto Ontario M1V 5M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-446-4080
Fax: 416-639-8998
Address: 2-136 Orton Park Road
Toronto Ontario M1G 3H1
Phone: 416-446-4080
Fax: 416-639-8998

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Oct 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 22 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Thuthiraj Sivapathasuntharam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Sivapathasuntharam (CPSO#: 123025 )
Business Address: 136 Orton Park Road, Unit 2
Toronto ONTARIO M1G 2V0
416-439-8888
Business Address: 2826A Markham Road
Toronto Ontario M1V 5M9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2826A Markham Road
Health Check Clinic
Toronto Ontario M1V 5M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-446-4080
Fax: 416-639-8998
Address: 2-136 Orton Park Road
Toronto Ontario M1G 3H1
Phone: 416-446-4080
Fax: 416-639-8998

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Oct 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 22 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Thuthiraj Sivapathasuntharam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Sivapathasuntharam (CPSO#: 123025 )
Business Address: 136 Orton Park Road, Unit 2
Toronto ONTARIO M1G 2V0
416-439-8888
Business Address: 2826A Markham Road
Toronto Ontario M1V 5M9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. THUTHIRAJ SIVAPATHASUNTHARAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIVAPATHASUNTHARAM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. THUTHIRAJ SIVAPATHASUNTHARAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIVAPATHASUNTHARAM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jan 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 10 Dec 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jan 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Dec 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 10 Dec 2020