THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:19:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PERSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2009 Long Lake Road
Suite 404
Greater Sudbury Ontario P3E 6C3
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: 705-885-2328
Fax: 705-806-0392
Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Health Sciences North
Otorhinolaryngology Division, Department of Surgical Subspecialties
Sudbury ON P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 523-7100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 06 Feb 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 06 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. DABIRI SATRI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Mar 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Dabiri Satri (CPSO#: 123061 )
Business Address: 128 Pine Street
Greater Sudbury Ontario P3C 1X3
705 885 2328
Business Address: 2009 Long Lake Road
Suite 404
Greater Sudbury Ontario P3E 6C3

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PERSIAN
Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2009 Long Lake Road
Suite 404
Greater Sudbury Ontario P3E 6C3
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: 705-885-2328
Fax: 705-806-0392
Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Health Sciences North
Otorhinolaryngology Division, Department of Surgical Subspecialties
Sudbury ON P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 523-7100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 06 Feb 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 06 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. DABIRI SATRI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Mar 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Dabiri Satri (CPSO#: 123061 )
Business Address: 128 Pine Street
Greater Sudbury Ontario P3C 1X3
705 885 2328
Business Address: 2009 Long Lake Road
Suite 404
Greater Sudbury Ontario P3E 6C3

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
06 Feb 2024
30 Jun 2030
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Feb 06 2024
EXPIRY DATE: Jun 30 2030
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. SASAN DABIRI SATRI may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Surgery, Division of Clinical Sciences, Northern Ontario School of Medicine, in which Dr. DABIRI SATRI holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. DABIRI SATRI no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. DABIRI SATRI’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. DABIRI SATRI’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 06 February, 2024, and expires on 30 June, 2030. Upon renewal of Dr. DABIRI SATRI's academic appointment at the Northern Ontario School of Medicine, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. SASAN DABIRI SATRI may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Surgery, Division of Clinical Sciences, Northern Ontario School of Medicine, in which Dr. DABIRI SATRI holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. DABIRI SATRI no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. DABIRI SATRI’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. DABIRI SATRI’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 06 February, 2024, and expires on 30 June, 2030. Upon renewal of Dr. DABIRI SATRI's academic appointment at the Northern Ontario School of Medicine, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Sep 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Feb 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 06 Feb 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2030

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Sep 2020