THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:12:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: Jemec-Sturdy, Barbara (Used Until: 02 Nov 2021)
Medical School: University of Copenhagen, 1991
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, DANISH, GERMAN, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 399 Bathurst St
Toronto Western Hospital
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-603-5220
Fax: 416 603 5392

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 10 Apr 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 10 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jemec Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 May 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Jemec (CPSO#: 123070 )
Business Address: 399 Bathurst Street
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
2 East Wing
Room 2E422
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8

General Information

Former Name: Jemec-Sturdy, Barbara (Used Until: 02 Nov 2021)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, DANISH, GERMAN, ITALIAN
Medical School: University of Copenhagen, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 399 Bathurst St
Toronto Western Hospital
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-603-5220
Fax: 416 603 5392

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 10 Apr 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 10 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jemec Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 May 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Jemec (CPSO#: 123070 )
Business Address: 399 Bathurst Street
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
2 East Wing
Room 2E422
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BARBARA JEMEC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JEMEC is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BARBARA JEMEC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JEMEC is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Copenhagen, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 25 Oct 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2021
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Mar 2022

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 25 Oct 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jan 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 06 Jan 2021