THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:12:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Dandelion Allergy Centre
8 - 348 Bronte St
Milton Ontario L9T 5B6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Dandelion Allergy Centre
C212-3885 Duke of York Blvd
Mississauga ON L5B 0E4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 237-1550 South Gateway Rd
Dandelion Allergy Centre
Mississauga ON L4W 5G6
Phone: 905 997 0888
Fax: 416 850 9993
Address: Polyclinic Family and Specialty Medicine
B17-2 Champagne Dr
North York ON M3J 0K2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 12 Mar 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Effective: 30 Nov 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 12 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Clinical Immunology and Allergy
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Parteet Sandhu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Jun 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Sandhu (CPSO#: 123085 )
Business Address: 237-1550 South Gateway Rd
Mississauga ON L4W 5G6
905-997-0888
Business Address: 8-348 Bronte St S
Milton ON L9T 5B6
905-997-0888
Business Address: C212-3885 Duke of York Blvd
Mississauga ON L5B 0E4
905-997-0888
Business Address: B17-2 Champagne Dr
North York ON M3J 0K2
416-222-6160

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Dandelion Allergy Centre
8 - 348 Bronte St
Milton Ontario L9T 5B6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Dandelion Allergy Centre
C212-3885 Duke of York Blvd
Mississauga ON L5B 0E4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 237-1550 South Gateway Rd
Dandelion Allergy Centre
Mississauga ON L4W 5G6
Phone: 905 997 0888
Fax: 416 850 9993
Address: Polyclinic Family and Specialty Medicine
B17-2 Champagne Dr
North York ON M3J 0K2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 12 Mar 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Effective: 30 Nov 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 12 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Clinical Immunology and Allergy
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Parteet Sandhu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Jun 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Sandhu (CPSO#: 123085 )
Business Address: 237-1550 South Gateway Rd
Mississauga ON L4W 5G6
905-997-0888
Business Address: 8-348 Bronte St S
Milton ON L9T 5B6
905-997-0888
Business Address: C212-3885 Duke of York Blvd
Mississauga ON L5B 0E4
905-997-0888
Business Address: B17-2 Champagne Dr
North York ON M3J 0K2
416-222-6160

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
25 Mar 2022
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 25 2022
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. PARTEET SANDHU may practise medicine independently in Clinical immunology and Allergy.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. PARTEET SANDHU may practise medicine independently in Clinical immunology and Allergy.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 25 Mar 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 25 Mar 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2020