THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 05:21:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: American University of Integrative Sci, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1176 St Clair Ave W
Toronto ON M6E 1B4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4162706789
Fax: 4164926789
Address: 230 Browns Line
Etobicoke ON M8W 3T4
Phone: 4166206861
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 199 Avenue Rd
Toronto ON M5R 2J3
Phone: 4166206861
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 29 Sep 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 29 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. G. KANDASAMY MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Oct 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Kandasamy (CPSO#: 123140 )
Business Address: 201-417 Spadina Road
Toronto Ontario M5P 2W3
416-840-8503

Corporation Name: DR. GURU KANDASAMY MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jan 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Kandasamy (CPSO#: 123140 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: American University of Integrative Sci, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1176 St Clair Ave W
Toronto ON M6E 1B4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4162706789
Fax: 4164926789
Address: 230 Browns Line
Etobicoke ON M8W 3T4
Phone: 4166206861
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 199 Avenue Rd
Toronto ON M5R 2J3
Phone: 4166206861
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 29 Sep 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 29 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. G. KANDASAMY MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Oct 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Kandasamy (CPSO#: 123140 )
Business Address: 201-417 Spadina Road
Toronto Ontario M5P 2W3
416-840-8503

Corporation Name: DR. GURU KANDASAMY MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jan 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Kandasamy (CPSO#: 123140 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GURU PARAN KANDASAMY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KANDASAMY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GURU PARAN KANDASAMY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KANDASAMY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: American University of Integrative Sci, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2020
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Oct 2020