THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:47:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 467 Notre Dame Street
Belleriver Health Centre
Belleriver Ontario N0R 1A0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-728-3355
Fax: 548-249-2249
Address: Princess Centre Clinic
102-33 Princess St
Leamington ON N8H 5C5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Erie Shores Health Care
194 Talbot St W
Leamington Ontario N8H 1N9
Phone: (519) 326-2373
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Jul 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 13 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Erie Shores Healthcare Leamington
HOSPITAL: Erie Shores Healthcare
LOCATION: Leamington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lauren De Rose Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Jun 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. L. De Rose (CPSO#: 123141 )
Business Address: 194 Talbot St W
Leamington ON N8H 1N9
313-870-2477 Extn: 519-326-2373
Business Address: 102-33 Princess St
Leamington ON N8H 5C5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 467 Notre Dame Street
Belleriver Health Centre
Belleriver Ontario N0R 1A0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-728-3355
Fax: 548-249-2249
Address: Princess Centre Clinic
102-33 Princess St
Leamington ON N8H 5C5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Erie Shores Health Care
194 Talbot St W
Leamington Ontario N8H 1N9
Phone: (519) 326-2373
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Jul 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 13 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Erie Shores Healthcare Leamington
HOSPITAL: Erie Shores Healthcare
LOCATION: Leamington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lauren De Rose Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Jun 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. L. De Rose (CPSO#: 123141 )
Business Address: 194 Talbot St W
Leamington ON N8H 1N9
313-870-2477 Extn: 519-326-2373
Business Address: 102-33 Princess St
Leamington ON N8H 5C5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAUREN GENA DE ROSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE ROSE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAUREN GENA DE ROSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE ROSE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Mar 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Oct 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 19 Oct 2020