THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 06:41:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC, ASSYRIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1187 Fischer-Hallman Road
unit 440
Kitchener Ontario N2E 4H9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5195701200
Fax: 5195701214

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Feb 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 01 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jonathan L. Martins Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Apr 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Alyashae (CPSO#: 123142 ) Dr. J. Martins (CPSO#: 123510 )
Business Address: 440-1187 Fischer Hallman Rd
Kitchener ON N2E 4H9
5195701200

Corporation Name: Dr. Zena Alyashae Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 01 Jan 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC, ASSYRIAN
Medical School: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1187 Fischer-Hallman Road
unit 440
Kitchener Ontario N2E 4H9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5195701200
Fax: 5195701214

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Feb 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 01 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jonathan L. Martins Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Apr 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Alyashae (CPSO#: 123142 ) Dr. J. Martins (CPSO#: 123510 )
Business Address: 440-1187 Fischer Hallman Rd
Kitchener ON N2E 4H9
5195701200

Corporation Name: Dr. Zena Alyashae Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 01 Jan 2024

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
23 Jun 2022
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jun 23 2022
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. ZENA ALYASHAE may practise medicine independently in family medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. ZENA ALYASHAE may practise medicine independently in family medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 23 Jun 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Feb 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Feb 2021