THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:13:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Star Kids Clinic
200-110 Copper Creek Dr
Markham ON L6B 0P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647 696 0945
Fax: 365 509 2154
Address: 2686 Danforth Ave
Thrive Kids Clinic
Toronto ON M4C 1L7
Phone: 416-849-2260
Fax: 416-849-2261

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 01 Nov 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 01 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. RANDY AUNG MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Sep 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Aung (CPSO#: 123158 )
Business Address: 110 Copper Creek Dr
Star Kids Clinic
Unit 200
Markham ON L6B 0P9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Star Kids Clinic
200-110 Copper Creek Dr
Markham ON L6B 0P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647 696 0945
Fax: 365 509 2154
Address: 2686 Danforth Ave
Thrive Kids Clinic
Toronto ON M4C 1L7
Phone: 416-849-2260
Fax: 416-849-2261

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 01 Nov 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 01 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. RANDY AUNG MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Sep 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Aung (CPSO#: 123158 )
Business Address: 110 Copper Creek Dr
Star Kids Clinic
Unit 200
Markham ON L6B 0P9

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
25 May 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 25 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. RANDY AUNG may practise medicine independently in pediatrics.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. RANDY AUNG may practise medicine independently in pediatrics.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 25 May 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Apr 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 25 May 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Feb 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Feb 2021