THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 04:01:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dow University of Health Sciences, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 525 Belmont Avenue West
Suite 108
Kitchener Ontario N2M 5E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 578 0480
Fax: 5195788493

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 10 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr Beenish Khan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 May 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Khan (CPSO#: 123192 )
Business Address: 525 Belmont Avenue West
Suite 108
Kitchener Ontario N2M 5E2
519 578 0480

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: Dow University of Health Sciences, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 525 Belmont Avenue West
Suite 108
Kitchener Ontario N2M 5E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 578 0480
Fax: 5195788493

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 10 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr Beenish Khan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 May 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Khan (CPSO#: 123192 )
Business Address: 525 Belmont Avenue West
Suite 108
Kitchener Ontario N2M 5E2
519 578 0480

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BEENISH MURAD KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BEENISH MURAD KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dow University of Health Sciences, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Mar 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 14 May 2021
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Mar 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 May 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 14 May 2021