THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:12:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1025 Queen St W
CAMH
Early Psychosis Intervention
Toronto ON M6J 1H1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-535-8501
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 700 Bay St
University of Toronto
University Student Mental Health
Toronto ON M5G 1Z6
Phone: 416-978-8030
Extension: 5
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 28 Sep 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Effective: 14 Sep 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 28 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 14 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shivani D. Jain Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Dec 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Jain (CPSO#: 123205 )
Business Address: 80 Workman Way
Toronto ON M6J 1H4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1025 Queen St W
CAMH
Early Psychosis Intervention
Toronto ON M6J 1H1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-535-8501
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 700 Bay St
University of Toronto
University Student Mental Health
Toronto ON M5G 1Z6
Phone: 416-978-8030
Extension: 5
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 28 Sep 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Effective: 14 Sep 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 28 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 14 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shivani D. Jain Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Dec 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Jain (CPSO#: 123205 )
Business Address: 80 Workman Way
Toronto ON M6J 1H4

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
06 May 2022
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 06 2022
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. SHIVANI DEVI JAIN may practise medicine independently in psychiatry and child and adolescent psychiatry.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. SHIVANI DEVI JAIN may practise medicine independently in psychiatry and child and adolescent psychiatry.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 06 May 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 18 Feb 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 06 May 2022

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 18 Feb 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Sep 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 28 Sep 2020