THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 03:44:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Aureus University, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 6535 W Camelback Rd
Phoenix AZ 85033-1608
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 28 Jul 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 28 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: JUSTIN ANTHONY ZEPPIERI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Aug 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Zeppieri (CPSO#: 123228 )
Business Address: 202 Walmer Road
Toronto Ontario M5R 3R7
4372374519

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Aureus University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 6535 W Camelback Rd
Phoenix AZ 85033-1608
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 28 Jul 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 28 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: JUSTIN ANTHONY ZEPPIERI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Aug 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Zeppieri (CPSO#: 123228 )
Business Address: 202 Walmer Road
Toronto Ontario M5R 3R7
4372374519

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
28 Jul 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jul 28 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Justin Anthony Zeppieri may practise medicine independently in psychiatry.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Justin Anthony Zeppieri may practise medicine independently in psychiatry.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Aureus University, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jun 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 May 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 21 Oct 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jul 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 28 Jul 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 05 May 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 21 Oct 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Oct 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 21 Oct 2020